TX HCR148 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designating June as Veteran Suicide and PTSD Awareness Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating June as Veteran Suicide and PTSD Awareness Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Adopted RV#960 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAdopted
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#960
2019-05-03HouseAdopted
2019-05-03HouseLaid before the House
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-25HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-04-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback