TX HCR36 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to ensure that the survivors and surviving families of the Sutherland Springs mass shooting receive compensation equivalent to the relief provided to those impacted by similar incidents.
Title
Urging Congress to ensure that the survivors and surviving families of the Sutherland Springs mass shooting receive compensation equivalent to the relief provided to those impacted by similar incidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - Adopted RV#343 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#343 |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Community Safety, Select |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
SUTHERLAND SPRINGS, COMMUNITY OF
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
SUTHERLAND SPRINGS, COMMUNITY OF