TX HCR86 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Amarillo City Council member James Harold Simms.
Title
In memory of Amarillo City Council member James Harold Simms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-04-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-04-08 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-03-26 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |