TX HJR2 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-29 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-29 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide for revenue from motor fuel taxes to be used solely for constructing, maintaining, and acquiring rights-of-way for certain public roadways and to provide for the transfer of certain general revenue to the economic stabilization fund and the available school fund.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to provide for revenue from motor fuel taxes to be used solely for constructing, maintaining, and acquiring rights-of-way for certain public roadways and to provide for the transfer of certain general revenue to the economic stabilization fund and the available school fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pickett [D] | Rep. Larry Phillips [R] | Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-29 - House - HJR 2Third Reading House (Y: 84 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - HJR 2Third Reading House (Y: 108 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - HJR 2Third Reading House (Y: 92 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 7 (Y: 74 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 6 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 5 (Y: 70 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2013-07-18 - House - HJR 2Third Reading House (Y: 108 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - HJR 2Third Reading House (Y: 92 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 7 (Y: 74 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 6 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-15 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 5 (Y: 70 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-29 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-29 | House | House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept. |
2013-07-29 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2013-07-28 | House | Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed |
2013-07-28 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-07-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-07-27 | House | Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-07-25 | House | Scheduled for conference committee meeting |
2013-07-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-07-25 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2013-07-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-07-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2013-07-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2013-07-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-07-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2013-07-25 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2013-07-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-07-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-07-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Adopted as amended |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Amended |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-07-19 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-07-18 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-18 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-18 | House | Adopted |
2013-07-18 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-07-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-07-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-15 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-07-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-15 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-07-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-15 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-07-15 | House | Amended |
2013-07-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-07-15 | House | Record vote |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment to amendment tabled |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-07-15 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-07-15 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-07-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-07-15 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2013-07-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-07-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-07-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-07-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-07-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-07-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-07-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-07-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-07-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-07-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-07-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-07-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-07-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-07-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-07-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB16 (Enabled by) 2013-07-30 - House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Subjects
AVAILABLE SCHOOL FUND
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Highways
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Highways
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration