TX HJR42 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment concerning the limitation on the rate of growth of state appropriations and the use of unencumbered surplus state revenues to provide for a rebate of state franchise taxes, to reduce public school district property taxes, and to fund the state's rainy day fund.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment concerning the limitation on the rate of growth of state appropriations and the use of unencumbered surplus state revenues to provide for a rebate of state franchise taxes, to reduce public school district property taxes, and to fund the state's rainy day fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time | |
2010-12-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB380 (Enabled by) 2011-04-28 - Left pending in committee
HB2775 (Enabled by) 2011-03-16 - Referred to Appropriations
HB2775 (Enabled by) 2011-03-16 - Referred to Appropriations
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HJR42 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HJ00042I.htm |