TX HJR72 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow the surviving spouse of a person who is disabled to receive a limitation on school district ad valorem taxes on the person's residence homestead if the spouse is 55 years of age or older at the time of the person's death.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow the surviving spouse of a person who is disabled to receive a limitation on school district ad valorem taxes on the person's residence homestead if the spouse is 55 years of age or older at the time of the person's death.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB875 (Enabled by) 2013-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HJR72 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HJ00072I.htm |