TX HR109 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating The University of Texas at El Paso men's track and field team on winning the 2013 Conference USA outdoor championship.
Title
Congratulating The University of Texas at El Paso men's track and field team on winning the 2013 Conference USA outdoor championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-18 | House | Filed |