TX HR121 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Rabbi Dov Mandel for his service to Chabad Lubavitch of Fort Worth and Tarrant County.
Title
Recognizing Rabbi Dov Mandel for his service to Chabad Lubavitch of Fort Worth and Tarrant County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-19 | House | Filed |