TX HR1286 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 30, 2019, as County Government Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 30, 2019, as County Government Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COUNTY GOVERNMENT DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates