TX HR1550 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing the members of the Coastal Bend Advocates for their many worthy endeavors.
Title
Recognizing the members of the Coastal Bend Advocates for their many worthy endeavors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-30 | Adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-24 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-22 | Filed |