TX HR1552 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Amarillo College mass media students on winning 36 awards at the 2021 Texas Intercollegiate Press Association Convention.
Title
Congratulating Amarillo College mass media students on winning 36 awards at the 2021 Texas Intercollegiate Press Association Convention.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Filed |