TX HR1609 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Bell flight company on winning the U.S. Army contract to manufacture the V-280 Valor tiltrotor for the Future Long-Range Assault Aircraft program.
Title
Congratulating Bell flight company on winning the U.S. Army contract to manufacture the V-280 Valor tiltrotor for the Future Long-Range Assault Aircraft program.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Salman Bhojani [D] |
Rep. Craig Goldman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Filed |