TX HR1684 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Angleton Christian School boys' basketball team on winning the 2023 TCAL 2A state championship.
Title
Congratulating the Angleton Christian School boys' basketball team on winning the 2023 TCAL 2A state championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Filed |