TX HR1705 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Thomas W. Pollard on his retirement as county judge for Kerr County.
Title
Congratulating Thomas W. Pollard on his retirement as county judge for Kerr County.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-22 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Filed |