TX HR1714 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Child Protection Day at the State Capitol on April 1, 2015.
Title
Recognizing Child Protection Day at the State Capitol on April 1, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD PROTECTION DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates