TX HR1752 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dr. Mary Ann Rankin on her selection as president and CEO of the National Math and Science Initiative.
Title
Congratulating Dr. Mary Ann Rankin on her selection as president and CEO of the National Math and Science Initiative.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-12 | Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-05-04 | Filed |