TX HR2359 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Roosevelt Weeks of the Austin Public Library on being named the 2023 Librarian of the Year by the Texas Library Association.
Title
Congratulating Roosevelt Weeks of the Austin Public Library on being named the 2023 Librarian of the Year by the Texas Library Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-25 | House | Filed |