TX HR2470 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
In memory of Barbara Gene Ross of Angleton.
Title
In memory of Barbara Gene Ross of Angleton.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Adopted | |
2009-05-28 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-22 | Filed |