TX HR815 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Nancy Torres for her service as principal of Fabens Middle School in the Fabens Independent School District.
Title
Commending Nancy Torres for her service as principal of Fabens Middle School in the Fabens Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-28 | House | Filed |