TX HR860 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Fernando Miranda for his service as principal of Col. Ben Narbuth Elementary School in the Socorro Independent School District.
Title
Commending Fernando Miranda for his service as principal of Col. Ben Narbuth Elementary School in the Socorro Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-28 | House | Filed |