TX SB1017 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas and the Texas Private Security Board.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas and the Texas Private Security Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2730 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRIVATE SECURITY BOARD, TEXAS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset Bills
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PRIVATE SECURITY BOARD, TEXAS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset Bills
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID