TX SB1022 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an unsworn declaration made by a private process server in the performance of the server's job duties.
Title
Relating to an unsworn declaration made by a private process server in the performance of the server's job duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |