TX SB1047 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding and activities of the Texas Produced Water Consortium.
Title
Relating to funding and activities of the Texas Produced Water Consortium.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Sen. Morgan LaMantia [D] | Rep. Carl Tepper [R] |
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#729 (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-13 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-01 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#729 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2757 |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2757 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2757 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2757 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Environment
Environment--Water
Oil & Gas
PRODUCED WATER CONSORTIUM, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
Water--Development
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Environment
Environment--Water
Oil & Gas
PRODUCED WATER CONSORTIUM, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
Water--Development