TX SB1087 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state-issued certificates of franchise authority to provide cable service and video service.
Title
Relating to state-issued certificates of franchise authority to provide cable service and video service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-26 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-24 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-23 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-23 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-17 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-17 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-17 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-17 | Read | |
2011-05-17 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-12 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-06 | Record vote | |
2011-04-06 | Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-06 | Record vote | |
2011-04-06 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-06 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-06 | Amended | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Filed | |
2011-03-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
FRANCHISES
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
TELEVISION
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
FRANCHISES
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
TELEVISION
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications