TX SB1096 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to certain charges included in a retail installment agreement.
Title
Relating to certain charges included in a retail installment agreement.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed | |
2009-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |