TX SB1096 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-26 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-26 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of State Highway 20 as a historic highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of State Highway 20 as a historic highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Filed | |
2011-03-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Highways
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
STATE HIGHWAY 20
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
STATE HIGHWAY 20
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF