TX SB1140 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to payment by a water control and improvement district for certain damages caused by the district's operation of a sanitary sewer system.
Title
Relating to payment by a water control and improvement district for certain damages caused by the district's operation of a sanitary sewer system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-16 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-12 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-09 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-03 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-03 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Filed | |
2011-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer