TX SB1198 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for physicians who perform abortions; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to requirements for physicians who perform abortions; creating an offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] |
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] | Sen. Kenneth Paxton [R] | Sen. Tommy Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Abortion
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS