TX SB1200 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a commission to recommend a new system for student assessment and public school accountability.
Title
Relating to the creation of a commission to recommend a new system for student assessment and public school accountability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
NEXT GENERATION ASSESSMENT AND ACCOUNTABILITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
NEXT GENERATION ASSESSMENT AND ACCOUNTABILITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed