TX SB1206 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the governor's broadband council.
Title
Relating to the creation of the governor's broadband council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1960 (Similar To) 2019-05-25 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BROADBAND NETWORKS
Governor
GOVERNOR'S BROADBAND COUNCIL
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
Governor
GOVERNOR'S BROADBAND COUNCIL
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1206 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01206I.htm |