TX SB1238 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition and duties of and investigations conducted by the Texas Forensic Science Commission, the administrative attachment of the Texas Forensic Science Commission to Sam Houston State University, the accreditation of criminal laboratories by the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, and the status of certain local government corporations as criminal justice agencies for the purpose of engaging in criminal identification activities, including forensic analysis.
Title
Relating to the composition and duties of and investigations conducted by the Texas Forensic Science Commission, the administrative attachment of the Texas Forensic Science Commission to Sam Houston State University, the accreditation of criminal laboratories by the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, and the status of certain local government corporations as criminal justice agencies for the purpose of engaging in criminal identification activities, including forensic analysis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-17 - House - SB 1238Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-07 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
FORENSIC SCIENCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
FORENSIC TESTING
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
FORENSIC TESTING
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions