TX SB1283 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the supervision by the Texas Department of Transportation of money appropriated by the federal government for the construction and maintenance of rail facilities.
Title
Relating to the supervision by the Texas Department of Transportation of money appropriated by the federal government for the construction and maintenance of rail facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-31 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed | |
2009-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2434 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Effective immediately