TX SB1309 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to the regulation of commercial fertilizer.
Title
Relating to the regulation of commercial fertilizer.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed | |
2009-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2527 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09