TX SB1343 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the capture, use, or recording of certain items for commercial purposes, including the prosecution of criminal offenses regarding unauthorized recordings.
Title
Relating to the capture, use, or recording of certain items for commercial purposes, including the prosecution of criminal offenses regarding unauthorized recordings.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1326 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Amended RV#1313 (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1326 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Amended RV#1313 (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | House | Passed |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-17 | House | Amended |
2017-05-17 | House | Point of order overruled |
2017-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |