TX SB1349 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to placing a child in the possessory conservatorship of the child's parents in certain situations.
Title
Relating to placing a child in the possessory conservatorship of the child's parents in certain situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Eckhardt |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3647 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Human Services