TX SB1376 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an employment preference for members of the military and their spouses for positions at state agencies.
Title
Relating to an employment preference for members of the military and their spouses for positions at state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-27 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2039 |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Wilson |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-16 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB5198 (Similar To) 2023-03-24 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
HB5198 (Similar To) 2023-03-24 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
HB5229 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Referred to Vet Affairs
HB5198 (Similar To) 2023-03-24 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
HB5229 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Referred to Vet Affairs
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees