TX SB1422 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Maxwell Special Utility District; providing authority to issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to impose fees and assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Maxwell Special Utility District; providing authority to issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to impose fees and assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Filed without the Governor's signature
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-05-07HouseRead first time
2019-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2019-03-01SenateFiled
2019-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback