TX SB1438 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibitions on the disposition of property interests by navigation districts for certain purposes.
Title
Relating to prohibitions on the disposition of property interests by navigation districts for certain purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1367 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1367 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
OYSTERS
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports