TX SB1479 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of emergency services in the Williamson-Travis Counties Water Control and Improvement District No. 1F.
Title
Relating to the provision of emergency services in the Williamson-Travis Counties Water Control and Improvement District No. 1F.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
WILLIAMSON-TRAVIS COUNTIES WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1F
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
WILLIAMSON-TRAVIS COUNTIES WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1F