TX SB1479 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reasonable break times and facilities for school district educators expressing breast milk.
Title
Relating to reasonable break times and facilities for school district educators expressing breast milk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Women
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Women