TX SB1481 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exercise of eminent domain authority by the Texas Facilities Commission to build a wall along this state's international border.
Title
Relating to the exercise of eminent domain authority by the Texas Facilities Commission to build a wall along this state's international border.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Border Security |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Property Interests--Real Property
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions