TX SB1497 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the registration and regulation of brokers by the Public Utility Commission of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the registration and regulation of brokers by the Public Utility Commission of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1429 (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1429
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-03HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2019-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-03HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-12HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-03SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3645 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback