TX SB1518 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a terrorist offender registry and to the supervision of those terrorist offenders; creating criminal offenses related to terrorism.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a terrorist offender registry and to the supervision of those terrorist offenders; creating criminal offenses related to terrorism.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1939 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1939 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1939 |
2023-05-22 | House | Passed |
2023-05-22 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-19 | House | Amended 1-Moody |
2023-05-19 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2023-05-19 | House | Postponed 5/19/23 3:00PM |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Border Security |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4968 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB4968 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB4968 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
DNA
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Law Enforcement
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
TERRORISM & INTERNAL SECURITY
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
DNA
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Law Enforcement
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
TERRORISM & INTERNAL SECURITY
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses