TX SB1535 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
Title
Relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF