TX SB155 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for participants in extracurricular athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League, including a sudden cardiac arrest awareness form.
Title
Relating to requirements for participants in extracurricular athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League, including a sudden cardiac arrest awareness form.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE