TX SB1617 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disclosure under the public information law of settlement communications maintained by or on behalf of the attorney general as part of a deceptive trade practices investigation or action.
Title
Relating to disclosure under the public information law of settlement communications maintained by or on behalf of the attorney general as part of a deceptive trade practices investigation or action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4899 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4899 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4899 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Open Records
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Open Records