TX SB1624 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Prairie View A&M University's eligibility to participate in the research development fund.
Title
Relating to Prairie View A&M University's eligibility to participate in the research development fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-11 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-27 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
PRAIRIE VIEW A&M UNIVERSITY
Science & Technology
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
PRAIRIE VIEW A&M UNIVERSITY
Science & Technology
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB1624 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB01624I.htm |