TX SB1637 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 13(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administrative, civil, and criminal consequences, including fines, fees, and costs, imposed on persons arrested for, charged with, or convicted of certain criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administrative, civil, and criminal consequences, including fines, fees, and costs, imposed on persons arrested for, charged with, or convicted of certain criminal offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HousePoint of order sustained Rule 8, Section 13(c)
2019-05-22HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Collier
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-10SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback