TX SB1652 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing the holder of a brewpub license to sell beer, ale, and malt liquor to certain wholesalers, distributors, and qualified persons outside the state.
Title
Relating to allowing the holder of a brewpub license to sell beer, ale, and malt liquor to certain wholesalers, distributors, and qualified persons outside the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2015-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |