TX SB1707 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the use of proceeds from criminal asset forfeiture to provide college scholarships to children of peace officers killed in the line of duty and to an annual report regarding the total value of forfeited property in this state.
Title
Relating to the use of proceeds from criminal asset forfeiture to provide college scholarships to children of peace officers killed in the line of duty and to an annual report regarding the total value of forfeited property in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Christian [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D] | Rep. Terri Hodge [D] |
Rep. Carol Kent [D] | Rep. Robert Miklos [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Paula Pierson [D] |
Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Allen Vaught [D] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Passed | |
2009-05-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-08 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-08 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--General
PEACE OFFICERS
SCHOLARSHIPS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--General
PEACE OFFICERS
SCHOLARSHIPS